NY A08278 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - SIGNED CHAP.252
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - SIGNED CHAP.252
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing a final average salary disability retirement benefit to certain participants in World Trade Center rescue, recovery, or cleanup operations.
Title
Relates to providing a final average salary disability retirement benefit to certain participants in World Trade Center rescue, recovery, or cleanup operations.
Sponsors
Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Edward Ra [R] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] |
Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.252 |
2019-09-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.631 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8278c |
2019-06-20 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1805 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5898D |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5898C |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5898B |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5898A |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5898d |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.631 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.631 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | print number 8278c |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | print number 8278b |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | print number 8278a |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05898 (Same As) 2019-09-11 - SIGNED CHAP.252