NY A08280 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - substituted by s8806
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an electronic personal voter registration process integrated within designated agency applications; requires the state board of elections to promulgate necessary rules and regulations; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an electronic personal voter registration process integrated within designated agency applications; requires the state board of elections to promulgate necessary rules and regulations; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-23Assemblysubstituted by s8806
2020-07-20Assemblyamended on third reading 8280c
2020-02-04Assemblyrestored to third reading
2020-02-04Assemblyamended by restoring to previous print 8280a
2020-02-03Assemblyamended on third reading 8280b
2020-01-08Assemblyordered to third reading cal.322
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.678
2019-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.678
2019-06-20Assemblyreported
2019-06-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-19Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2019-06-16Assemblyprint number 8280a
2019-06-16Assemblyamend and recommit to election law
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S06457 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - referred to election law
S08806 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A8280
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08280&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08280
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08280&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08280A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08280&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08280B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08280&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08280C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08280&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08280&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1

Bill Comments

feedback