NY A08284 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.531
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.531
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Amsterdam, in the county of Montgomery, to finance a certain deficit by the issuance of bonds.
Title
Authorizes the city of Amsterdam, in the county of Montgomery, to finance a certain deficit by the issuance of bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.531 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.479 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a8284a |
2019-06-18 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1592 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6465A |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6465a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.479 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.479 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | print number 8284a |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to cities |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S06465 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.531