NY A08288 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires combination gas and electric corporations, the New York Power Authority, and the Long Island Power Authority to provide an annual transparency statement to customers detailing certain charges on a gross basis which are included in each customer's delivery service portion of their utility bill.
Title
Requires combination gas and electric corporations, the New York Power Authority, and the Long Island Power Authority to provide an annual transparency statement to customers detailing certain charges on a gross basis which are included in each customer's delivery service portion of their utility bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Senate | tabled |
2018-12-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.337 |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-04-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-04-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.96 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6335C |
2018-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.743 |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | print number 8288b |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | print number 8288a |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06335 (Same As) 2018-04-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8288B