NY A08292 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a kitchen incubator/shared-use kitchen facility program within the urban development corporation; provides grant funding to local development corporations, municipalities, educational institutions and not-for-profit entities for the development or expansion of kitchen incubator/shared-use kitchen facilities which make available services such as food production, technical assistance, business management and marketing, distribution, storage and retailing assistance, particularly in economically distressed areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a kitchen incubator/shared-use kitchen facility program within the urban development corporation; provides grant funding to local development corporations, municipalities, educational institutions and not-for-profit entities for the development or expansion of kitchen incubator/shared-use kitchen facilities which make available services such as food production, technical assistance, business management and marketing, distribution, storage and retailing assistance, particularly in economically distressed areas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatetabled
2018-12-21Senatevetoed memo.303
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2102
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3362A
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.278
2018-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.278
2018-06-18Assemblyreported
2018-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-05-22Assemblyprint number 8292a
2018-05-22Assemblyamend and recommit to economic development
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to economic development
2017-06-06Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S03362 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8292A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08292&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08292&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08292
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08292&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08292A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08292&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08292&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08292&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08292&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A8292#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback