NY A08293 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.127
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.127
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Validates certain acts of the Islip Union Free school district with regard to certain capital improvement projects including project numbers 0003-12, 0011-007, 0011-008, 0003-013, 0007-009, 0007-010, 0007-012 and 0011-009.
Title
Validates certain acts of the Islip Union Free school district with regard to certain capital improvement projects including project numbers 0003-12, 0011-007, 0011-008, 0003-013, 0007-009, 0007-010, 0007-012 and 0011-009.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.127 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.565 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8293 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1503 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 644A |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s644a |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.565 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.565 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S00644 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.127