NY A08302 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the commissioner of transportation to impound or immobilize stretch limousines in certain situations; provides that such impounded motor vehicle shall not be released unless the commissioner of transportation is satisfied that repairs have been scheduled or been made to satisfactorily adjust such vehicle's out-of-service defect or defects; makes related provisions.
Title
Allows the commissioner of transportation to impound or immobilize stretch limousines in certain situations; provides that such impounded motor vehicle shall not be released unless the commissioner of transportation is satisfied that repairs have been scheduled or been made to satisfactorily adjust such vehicle's out-of-service defect or defects; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | committed to codes |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 8302a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.323 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.480 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.480 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06193 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - signed chap.9