NY A08308 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - amended on third reading (t) 8308b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - amended on third reading (t) 8308b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits retail dealers of second hand motor vehicles from selling a motor vehicle which is subject to federal motor vehicle safety standards for inflatable restraint systems unless such vehicle is equipped with an inflatable restraint system which conforms to the federal motor vehicle safety standard applicable to that vehicle and a readiness indicator light indicating a functioning inflatable restraint system.
Title
Prohibits retail dealers of second hand motor vehicles from selling a motor vehicle which is subject to federal motor vehicle safety standards for inflatable restraint systems unless such vehicle is equipped with an inflatable restraint system which conforms to the federal motor vehicle safety standard applicable to that vehicle and a readiness indicator light indicating a functioning inflatable restraint system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 8308b |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 8308a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.324 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.481 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.481 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06513 (Same As) 2020-07-02 - PRINT NUMBER 6513B