NY A08326 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.229
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.229
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing the Yeshiva of Staten Island to provide driver education courses in alternate locations including at the Arthur Kill Road Jewish Community Center of Staten Island and the Manor Road Jewish Community Center of Staten Island, located in the county of Richmond.
Title
Relates to allowing the Yeshiva of Staten Island to provide driver education courses in alternate locations including at the Arthur Kill Road Jewish Community Center of Staten Island and the Manor Road Jewish Community Center of Staten Island, located in the county of Richmond.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.229 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.355 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted for a8326 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2020-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.681 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1685 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s3860 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.355 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.355 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S03860 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.229