NY A08336 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s5886a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an electronic open auction public bond sale pilot program to conduct open auction public bond sales through nationally recognized securities bidding services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an electronic open auction public bond sale pilot program to conduct open auction public bond sales through nationally recognized securities bidding services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s5886a
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.568
2019-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.568
2019-06-18Assemblyreported
2019-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-06-14Assemblyprint number 8336a
2019-06-14Assemblyamend and recommit to local governments
2019-06-14Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S05886 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08336&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08336&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08336
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08336&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08336A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08336&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08336&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08336&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback