NY A08337 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - approval memo.24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - approval memo.24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for medical and psychiatric records of deceased inmates to be accessed by the board of correction of the city of New York under certain circumstances.
Title
Allows for medical and psychiatric records of deceased inmates to be accessed by the board of correction of the city of New York under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Senate | approval memo.24 |
2020-12-02 | Senate | signed chap.312 |
2020-11-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.794 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6437A |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.179 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.179 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | print number 8337b |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | print number 8337a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06437 (Same As) 2020-12-02 - approval memo.24