NY A08339 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - approval memo.20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - approval memo.20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Rye Country Day School to make the athletic field and track available for rental to public recreation groups for a certain amount of time per year and to provide opportunity of public rental of recreation buildings constructed on the parcel transferred from the thruway authority.
Title
Requires the Rye Country Day School to make the athletic field and track available for rental to public recreation groups for a certain amount of time per year and to provide opportunity of public rental of recreation buildings constructed on the parcel transferred from the thruway authority.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | approval memo.20 |
2019-11-25 | Senate | signed chap.547 |
2019-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1644 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6494 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.570 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.570 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06494 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - approval memo.20