NY A08340 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - substituted by s6322
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - substituted by s6322
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of the department of corrections and community supervision to undertake a study of the surveillance, prevention, treatment and prevalence of hepatitis C among the inmate population.
Title
Directs the commissioner of the department of corrections and community supervision to undertake a study of the surveillance, prevention, treatment and prevalence of hepatitis C among the inmate population.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | substituted by s6322 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.48 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.48 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2017-06-09 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S06322 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.429