NY A08343 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to dependent workers; defines the term "dependent worker"; requires the commissioner of labor to hold public meetings to examine state laws relating to dependent workers.
Title
Relates to dependent workers; defines the term "dependent worker"; requires the commissioner of labor to hold public meetings to examine state laws relating to dependent workers.
Sponsors
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] |
Asm. Joseph Lentol [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S06538 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR