NY A08347 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-7)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.233
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.233
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the New York agricultural investment task force act; establishes the New York task force on agricultural investment to study and assess the future of agriculture in the state.
Title
Enacts the New York agricultural investment task force act; establishes the New York task force on agricultural investment to study and assess the future of agriculture in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.233 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.573 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8347 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1743 |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6553 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.573 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.573 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06553 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.233