NY A08351 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to development or redevelopment of Pier 40 in the Hudson river park and amount of passive and active public open space necessary for such development or redevelopment.
Title
Relates to development or redevelopment of Pier 40 in the Hudson river park and amount of passive and active public open space necessary for such development or redevelopment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-31 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.290 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.615 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8351 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1802 |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6566 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.615 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.615 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S06566 (Same As) 2019-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.290