NY A08355 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.232
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designates Great Valley creek and its tributaries as inland waterways for purposes of waterfront revitalization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates Great Valley creek and its tributaries as inland waterways for purposes of waterfront revitalization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.232
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-04Senate3RD READING CAL.1107
2018-06-04SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6821A
2018-05-09SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-05-09Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-09Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-03Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.842
2018-05-01Assemblyreported
2018-01-30Assemblyprint number 8355b
2018-01-30Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-21Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-20Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2017-06-19Assemblyprint number 8355a
2017-06-19Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation
2017-06-12Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S06598 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
S06821 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8355B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08355&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08355&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08355
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08355&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08355A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08355&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08355B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08355&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08355&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08355&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A8355#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback