NY A08366 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an energy-related public utility mass real property central assessment program.
Title
Establishes an energy-related public utility mass real property central assessment program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05325 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT