NY A08375 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - substituted by s6573
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that it shall not be an affirmative defense for murder that the defendant's conduct resulted substantially from the discovery, knowledge or disclosure of the victim's sexual orientation, sex, gender, gender identity, gender expression or sex assigned at birth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that it shall not be an affirmative defense for murder that the defendant's conduct resulted substantially from the discovery, knowledge or disclosure of the victim's sexual orientation, sex, gender, gender identity, gender expression or sex assigned at birth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted by s6573
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.537
2019-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.537
2019-06-18Assemblyreported
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-15Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S06543 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06573 (Same As) 2019-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.45

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback