NY A08382 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.233
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires immediate notification by law enforcement of the filing of an accusatory instrument alleging a sex offense by an employee; provides that no cause of action against law enforcement or school district shall exist for damages related to the dissemination of criminal history or arrest records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires immediate notification by law enforcement of the filing of an accusatory instrument alleging a sex offense by an employee; provides that no cause of action against law enforcement or school district shall exist for damages related to the dissemination of criminal history or arrest records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.233
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1455
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6597B
2018-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.225
2018-06-14Assemblyrules report cal.225
2018-06-14Assemblyreported
2018-06-13Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 8382b
2018-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-02-16Assemblyprint number 8382a
2018-02-16Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to education
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to education
2017-06-12Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S06597 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8382B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08382&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08382&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08382
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08382&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08382A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08382&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08382B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08382&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08382&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08382&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08382&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A8382#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback