NY A08404 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-17 - SIGNED CHAP.377
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-17 - SIGNED CHAP.377
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes protections from excess hospital charges.
Title
Establishes protections from excess hospital charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.377 |
2019-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.538 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8404 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1654 |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6544A |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6544a |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.538 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.538 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06544 (Same As) 2019-10-17 - SIGNED CHAP.377