NY A08407 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - substituted by s6418a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to opportunities for small businesses and businesses owned by women and minorities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to opportunities for small businesses and businesses owned by women and minorities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted by s6418a
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.577
2019-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.577
2019-06-18Assemblyreported
2019-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-16Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S06418 (Same As) 2019-07-15 - SIGNED CHAP.98

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback