NY A08411 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants retroactive membership in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Joseph J. Maltese.
Title
Grants retroactive membership in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Joseph J. Maltese.
Sponsors
Asm. Ron Castorina [R] | Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. Joseph Lentol [D] |
Asm. Nicole Malliotakis [R] | Asm. Peter Lawrence [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Senate | tabled |
2018-12-07 | Senate | vetoed memo.287 |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2051 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6730B |
2018-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.405 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.405 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | print number 8411b |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | print number 8411a |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06730 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8411B