NY A08414 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - signed chap.96
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to minority and women business enterprises; extends the provisions of article 15-a of the executive law; provides for punishment for fraud related to minority and women business enterprises (Part ).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to minority and women business enterprises; extends the provisions of article 15-a of the executive law; provides for punishment for fraud related to minority and women business enterprises (Part ).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15Senatesigned chap.96
2019-07-12Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1661
2019-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6575
2019-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.578
2019-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.578
2019-06-18Assemblyreported
2019-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-16Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S06575 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8414

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08414&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08414&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08414
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08414&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08414&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08414&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A8414#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback