NY A08419 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - signed chap.105
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the farm laborers fair labor practices act: grants collective bargaining rights to farm laborers; requires employers of farm laborers to allow at least 24 consecutive hours of rest each week; provides for an 8 hour work day for farm laborers; requires overtime rate at one and one-half times normal rate; makes provisions of unemployment insurance law applicable to farm laborers; provides sanitary code shall apply to all farm and food processing labor camps intended to house migrant workers, regardless of the number of occupants; provides for eligibility of farm laborers for workers' compensation benefits; requires employers of farm laborers to provide such farm laborers with claim forms for workers' compensation claims under certain conditions; requires reporting of injuries to employers of farm laborers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the farm laborers fair labor practices act: grants collective bargaining rights to farm laborers; requires employers of farm laborers to allow at least 24 consecutive hours of rest each week; provides for an 8 hour work day for farm laborers; requires overtime rate at one and one-half times normal rate; makes provisions of unemployment insurance law applicable to farm laborers; provides sanitary code shall apply to all farm and food processing labor camps intended to house migrant workers, regardless of the number of occupants; provides for eligibility of farm laborers for workers' compensation benefits; requires employers of farm laborers to provide such farm laborers with claim forms for workers' compensation claims under certain conditions; requires reporting of injuries to employers of farm laborers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-17Senatesigned chap.105
2019-07-16Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1664
2019-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6578
2019-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.579
2019-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.579
2019-06-18Assemblyreported
2019-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-16Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S06578 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8419

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08419&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08419&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08419
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08419&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08419&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08419&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A8419#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback