NY A08420 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-29 - SIGNED CHAP.131
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-29 - SIGNED CHAP.131
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for vacating records for certain proceedings and modifies the definition of smoking.
Title
Provides for vacating records for certain proceedings and modifies the definition of smoking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.131 |
2019-07-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.669 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8420a |
2019-06-20 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1839 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6579A |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6579a |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.669 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | print number 8420a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06579 (Same As) 2019-07-29 - SIGNED CHAP.131