NY A08421 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 95-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides increased protections for protected classes and special protections for employees who have been sexually harassed; prohibits nondisclosure agreements related to discrimination; prohibits mandatory arbitration clauses related to discrimination; requires employers to provide employees notice of their sexual harassment prevention training program in writing in English and in employees' primary languages; extends the statute of limitations for claims resulting from unlawful or discriminatory practices constituting sexual harassment to three years; requires review and update of the model sexual harassment prevention guidance document and sexual harassment prevention policy; and directs the commissioner of labor to conduct a study on strengthening sexual harassment prevention laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides increased protections for protected classes and special protections for employees who have been sexually harassed; prohibits nondisclosure agreements related to discrimination; prohibits mandatory arbitration clauses related to discrimination; requires employers to provide employees notice of their sexual harassment prevention training program in writing in English and in employees' primary languages; extends the statute of limitations for claims resulting from unlawful or discriminatory practices constituting sexual harassment to three years; requires review and update of the model sexual harassment prevention guidance document and sexual harassment prevention policy; and directs the commissioner of labor to conduct a study on strengthening sexual harassment prevention laws.

Sponsors

Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Michele Titus [D]
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Helene Weinstein [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]
Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]
Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]
Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]
Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]
Asm. Diane Richardson [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]
Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. Jaime Williams [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]
Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Karen McMahon [D]Asm. Taylor Raynor [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]
Asm. Jamie Romeo [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Robin Schimminger [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]
Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]
Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]
Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]
Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]
Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Sean Ryan [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]
Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]
Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]
Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. D. Billy Jones [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. Simcha Eichenstein [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]
Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1663
2019-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6577
2019-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.580
2019-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.580
2019-06-18Assemblyreported
2019-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-06-16Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S06577 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8421

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08421&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08421&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08421
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08421&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08421&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08421&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08421&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A8421#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback