NY A08422 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.99
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.99
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a state monitor for the Wyandanch union free school district to provide direct oversight of the fiscal policies, practices, programs and decisions of such school district.
Title
Authorizes a state monitor for the Wyandanch union free school district to provide direct oversight of the fiscal policies, practices, programs and decisions of such school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.99 |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.754 |
2019-12-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.616 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8422a |
2019-06-20 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 6588A |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1803 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6588B |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6588A |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6588a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.616 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.616 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | print number 8422a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06588 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.99