NY A08424 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - SIGNED CHAP.161
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - SIGNED CHAP.161
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes certain chapter amendments relating to law providing increased protections for protected classes and special protections for employees who have been sexually harassed and relates to the effectiveness of certain claims.
Title
Makes certain chapter amendments relating to law providing increased protections for protected classes and special protections for employees who have been sexually harassed and relates to the effectiveness of certain claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.161 |
2019-08-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.617 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8424 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1749 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6594 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.617 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.617 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06594 (Same As) 2019-08-12 - SIGNED CHAP.161