NY A08427 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to loans by the housing trust fund corporation; provides that such loans may exceed the thirty year limit in instances where a lengthier period is necessary to provide for a loan term that is co-terminus with the terms of other financing or regulatory agencies participating in the project.
Title
Relates to loans by the housing trust fund corporation; provides that such loans may exceed the thirty year limit in instances where a lengthier period is necessary to provide for a loan term that is co-terminus with the terms of other financing or regulatory agencies participating in the project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S06199 (Same As) 2020-01-29 - referred to housing