NY A08429 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 87-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.106
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 87-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.106
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the New York state climate leadership and community protection act; relates to climate change; renewable energy program; labor and job standards and worker protection.
Title
Enacts the New York state climate leadership and community protection act; relates to climate change; renewable energy program; labor and job standards and worker protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.106 |
2019-07-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | message of necessity - 3 day message |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.634 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a8429 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | MESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1622 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6599 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.634 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06599 (Same As) 2019-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.106