NY A08441 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of court administration to publish annually on its website pretrial data and information related to pretrial detention.
Title
Requires the office of court administration to publish annually on its website pretrial data and information related to pretrial detention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | print number 8441b |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | print number 8441a |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06438 (Same As) 2020-02-05 - PRINT NUMBER 6438B