NY A08451 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a civil cause of action for human trafficking.
Title
Relates to a civil cause of action for human trafficking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S03032 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN