NY A08457 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.129
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.129
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that in the event that certain lands cease to be used exclusively by the International Boxing Hall of Fame for the purposes of developing, expanding and operating a boxing hall of fame and museum and are not developed by July 31, 2023, title to such lands and any improvements thereon shall revert to the state of New York.
Title
Provides that in the event that certain lands cease to be used exclusively by the International Boxing Hall of Fame for the purposes of developing, expanding and operating a boxing hall of fame and museum and are not developed by July 31, 2023, title to such lands and any improvements thereon shall revert to the state of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.129 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-05-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.682 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6677 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.797 |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06677 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8457