NY A08486 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - signed chap.101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - signed chap.101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration of provisions relating to including the trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of Southampton, trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of East Hampton and the trustees of Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of Southold as municipal corporations for the purposes of section 72-h of the general municipal law.
Title
Extends the expiration of provisions relating to including the trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of Southampton, trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of East Hampton and the trustees of Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of Southold as municipal corporations for the purposes of section 72-h of the general municipal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-24 | Senate | signed chap.101 |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2192 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6774 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.579 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.579 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06774 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8486