NY A08500 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on August 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the length of the term of office to four years for members of the legislature.
Title
Increases the length of the term of office to four years for members of the legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-08-16 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-08-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07140 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY