NY A08502 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on August 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - print number 8502a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - print number 8502a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to qualifying offenses for pre-trial detention.
Title
Relates to qualifying offenses for pre-trial detention.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Stern [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Michael Norris [R] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Asm. Brian Barnwell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Assembly | print number 8502a |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-08-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06407 (Same As) 2020-01-10 - PRINT NUMBER 6407C