NY A08511 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - signed chap.465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - signed chap.465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a prohibition on diversion of funds dedicated to public transportation systems.
Title
Relates to a prohibition on diversion of funds dedicated to public transportation systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Senate | signed chap.465 |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1106 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6807 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.798 |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06807 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8511