NY A08511 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.205
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.205
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the docketing of adjudications of certain violations of laws enforced by the New York city department of consumer affairs.
Title
Relates to the docketing of adjudications of certain violations of laws enforced by the New York city department of consumer affairs.
Sponsors
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] |
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Senate | signed chap.205 |
2020-09-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1005 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8787 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.181 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.181 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | print number 8511a |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-08-07 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |