NY A08517 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the public service commission to study and report on time-of-use plans offered by electric and gas utilities.
Title
Directs the public service commission to study and report on time-of-use plans offered by electric and gas utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Senate | tabled |
2020-11-11 | Senate | vetoed memo.55 |
2020-10-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.951 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8724 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.182 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.182 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | print number 8517a |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-08-07 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S00021 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
S08724 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - tabled
S08724 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - tabled