NY A08522 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - print number 8522a
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - print number 8522a
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the release of balloons with exceptions for manned hot air balloons, government-related experiments, and balloons released indoors.
Title
Prohibits the release of balloons with exceptions for manned hot air balloons, government-related experiments, and balloons released indoors.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Assembly | print number 8522a |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-08-07 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07985 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION