NY A08525 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on August 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires food establishments to secure grease trap and interceptor manholes that are located outdoors or accessible to the general public; includes requirements for the conspicuous posting of warning signs and provides for annual inspections of compliance.
Title
Requires food establishments to secure grease trap and interceptor manholes that are located outdoors or accessible to the general public; includes requirements for the conspicuous posting of warning signs and provides for annual inspections of compliance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-12-18 | Assembly | print number 8525a |
2019-12-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2019-08-07 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06656 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES