NY A08531 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on August 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - advanced to third reading cal.337
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - advanced to third reading cal.337
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the second Monday in July each year as a public holiday, to be known as Abolition Commemoration Day.
Title
Designates the second Monday in July each year as a public holiday, to be known as Abolition Commemoration Day.
Sponsors
Asm. Gary Pretlow [D] | Asm. Carl Heastie [D] | Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] |
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.337 |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-08-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06658 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.237