NY A08569 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - print number 8569a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - print number 8569a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires signs providing notice of the use of a photo speed violation monitoring system to be primarily yellow and be placed within fifty feet of a photo speed violation monitoring system.
Title
Requires signs providing notice of the use of a photo speed violation monitoring system to be primarily yellow and be placed within fifty feet of a photo speed violation monitoring system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Assembly | print number 8569a |
2020-02-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07742 (Same As) 2020-02-12 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION