NY A08610 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-03 - print number 8610a
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-03 - print number 8610a
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To help address and prevent abusive practices which have resulted from relationships between some home improvement contractors and some mortgage lenders or mortgage brokers.
Title
Provides that where a home improvement contractor is acting as a mortgage broker without being registered as required under the Banking Law, a mortgage banker, mortgage broker or exempt organization may not engage in such transaction with the contractor, and shall promptly notify the banking department that such person is acting as an unregistered broker.
Sponsors
Asm. Sam Hoyt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | print number 8610a | |
2010-06-03 | amend and recommit to banks | |
2010-01-06 | referred to banks | |
2009-05-29 | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S2843 (Same As) 2010-05-26 - PRINT NUMBER 2843A