NY A08616 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.184
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.184
Summary
Relates to the effectiveness of the sale of bonds and notes of the city of NY; NYS financial emergency act; interest rate exchange agreements and refunding of bonds.
Title
Relates to the effectiveness of the sale of bonds and notes of the city of NY; NYS financial emergency act; interest rate exchange agreements and refunding of bonds.
Sponsors
Asm. Jonathan Bing [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Sen. Adriano Espaillat [D] | Asm. Herman Farrell [D] |
Asm. Micah Kellner [D] | Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Adam Powell [D] | Asm. Keith Wright [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-11 | signed chap.184 | |
2009-07-10 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-09 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-09 | REPASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-09 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-06-30 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-06-30 | 3RD READING CAL.676 | |
2009-06-30 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5529 | |
2009-06-18 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-16 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-16 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-16 | ordered to third reading rules cal.381 | |
2009-06-16 | rules report cal.381 | |
2009-06-16 | reported | |
2009-06-16 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-05-29 | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05529 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.184
S60425 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65024 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S50016 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - PASSED SENATE
S60425 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65024 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S50016 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - PASSED SENATE
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08616&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |