NY A08617 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - print number 8617c
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to state procurement policies relating to requiring low embodied carbon concrete be used in state projects and creating a preferential standard for concrete implementing CO2 capture and utilization technologies; establishes the environmental product declaration tax credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to state procurement policies relating to requiring low embodied carbon concrete be used in state projects and creating a preferential standard for concrete implementing CO2 capture and utilization technologies; establishes the environmental product declaration tax credit.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01Assemblyprint number 8617c
2020-07-01Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2020-02-12Assemblyprint number 8617b
2020-02-12Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2019-11-15Assemblyprint number 8617a
2019-11-15Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to governmental operations
2019-10-02Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback