NY A08634 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-22 - print number 8634c
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-22 - print number 8634c
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of intoxication of the victim as a defense in sex crimes; amends the definition of "mentally incapacitated" to include persons who are voluntarily intoxicated.
Title
Prohibits the use of intoxication of the victim as a defense in sex crimes; amends the definition of "mentally incapacitated" to include persons who are voluntarily intoxicated.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-22 | Assembly | print number 8634c |
2020-04-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-12-18 | Assembly | print number 8634b |
2019-12-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-10-23 | Assembly | print number 8634a |
2019-10-23 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2019-10-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06679 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - referred to codes