NY A08644 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the eligibility period for indigent legal service attorneys to receive certain loan forgiveness and increases loan reimbursement for certain attorneys who work in legal services with indigent clients.
Title
Expands the eligibility period for indigent legal service attorneys to receive certain loan forgiveness and increases loan reimbursement for certain attorneys who work in legal services with indigent clients.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-10-02 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06668 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE