NY A08645 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-15 - print number 8645a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-15 - print number 8645a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines certain independent contractors who install temporary traffic controls as employees for purposes of defense and indemnification.
Title
Defines certain independent contractors who install temporary traffic controls as employees for purposes of defense and indemnification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | Assembly | print number 8645a |
2018-08-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01176 (Same As) 2018-04-30 - PRINT NUMBER 1176A